Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano d’Arco

Deceased

Bishop of Nusco, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1691³Born
22 Sep 171423.1Ordained PriestPriest
2 Dec 173544.3AppointedBishop of Strongoli, Italy
4 Dec 173544.3Ordained BishopBishop of Strongoli, Italy
6 Mar 174149.5AppointedBishop of Nusco, Italy
25 May 175361.8DiedBishop of Nusco, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaetano d’Arco
Bishop Gaetano d’Arco (born , died ) Bishop of Nusco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 316, and Page 387
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018