Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leone Luca Vita

Deceased

Bishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1688Born
11 Mar 171324.2Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 173445.1AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
21 Feb 173445.1Ordained BishopBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
24 Oct 174758.8DiedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Leone Luca Vita
Bishop Leone Luca Vita (born , died ) Bishop of Oppido Mamertina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonteleone

  • a priest for 34.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1736
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 318
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast