Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diomedes Bianconi

Deceased

Bishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1676BornReggio
22 Aug 170023.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 Aug 170023.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 173457.1AppointedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
21 Feb 173457.1Ordained BishopBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
29 Oct 173457.8DiedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Diomedes Bianconi:
Bishop Diomedes Bianconi (born , died ) Bishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia)

  • a priest for 34.1 years
  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 231
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015