Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco De Novellis

Deceased

Bishop of Sarno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1695Born
22 May 171722.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Jun 171823.2Ordained PriestPriest
2 Dec 173540.7AppointedBishop of Nicotera, Italy
4 Dec 173540.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nicotera, Italy
27 Jan 173842.8AppointedBishop of Sarno, Italy
19 Mar 173843.0InstalledBishop of Sarno, Italy
11 May 176065.1DiedBishop of Sarno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco De Novellis
Bishop Francesco De Novellis (born , died ) Bishop of Sarno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 310, and Page 368
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018