Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Caranza

Deceased

Bishop of Syros (e Milos)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1691³BornNaxos
7 Mar 171625.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Mar 171625.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Apr 173342.2AppointedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
3 May 173342.3Ordained BishopBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
Jun 1734³43.4DiedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Caranza:
Bishop Emmanuel Caranza (born , died Jun 1734) Bishop of Syros (e Milos)

  • a priest for 18.1 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 390
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1733, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015