Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Manola

Deceased

Bishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1695Born
3 Jun 171923.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 175559.9AppointedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
19 May 175559.9Ordained BishopBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
14 Feb 176569.6DiedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Diego Manola
Bishop Diego Manola (born , died ) Bishop of Trogir (Tra¨)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSplit

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 411
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1755, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast