Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Francesco Valenti

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Teodosia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1668³Born
21 Dec 172658.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 172758.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Teodosia
26 Jan 172758.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Teodosia
15 May 173162.4DiedTitular Archbishop of Teodosia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Francesco Valenti
Archbishop Antonio Francesco Valenti (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Teodosia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrevi

  • a priest for 4.4 years
  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 375
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast