Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Ciani, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Montalcino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1692Born
16 Feb 171522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
30 Jul 172735.3AppointedBishop of Montalcino, Italy
10 Aug 172735.4Ordained BishopBishop of Montalcino, Italy
9 Aug 176775.4DiedBishop of Montalcino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Ciani
Bishop Bernardino Ciani O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Montalcino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 227
  • c34: CB, 24 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018