Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppi Maria Massoni

Deceased

Bishop of Sagone (Sagona)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1707³BornCalenzana
Sep 1730³23.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 175144.4AppointedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
26 Sep 175144.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
May 1765³58.0DiedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppi Maria Massoni:
Bishop Giuseppi Maria Massoni (born , died May 1765) Bishop of Sagone (Sagona)

  • a priest for 34.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 362
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1751, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015