Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Barone

Deceased

Bishop of Calvi Risorta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1680³BornNapoli
28 Mar 170524.5Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 172949.2AppointedBishop of Bova, Italy
25 Dec 172949.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bova, Italy
5 Mar 173150.4AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
1 Apr 173150.5InstalledBishop of Marsi, Italy
29 May 174160.6AppointedBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy
12 Jan 174261.3DiedBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Barone:
Bishop Giuseppe Barone (born , died ) Bishop of Calvi Risorta

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 125
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 141, and Page 277
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015