Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Antonio Pallante

Deceased

Bishop of San Severo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1703³Born
21 Dec 172623.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Nov 176158.0AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
30 Nov 176158.0Ordained BishopBishop of San Severo, Italy
1 Oct 176561.8DiedBishop of San Severo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Antonio Pallante
Bishop Angelo Antonio Pallante (born , died ) Bishop of San Severo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBagnolo

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 377
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1761, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast