Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Felice Guelfi Camaiani

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Colle di Val d’Elsa

Titular Bishop of Seleucia in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1714³BornArezzo
22 Nov 175844.0AppointedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
26 Nov 175844.1Ordained BishopBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
6 Aug 177257.8ResignedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
7 Sep 177257.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Seleucia in Isauria
27 Apr 177358.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Felice Guelfi Camaiani:
Bishop Bartolomeo Felice Guelfi Camaiani (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Colle di Val d’Elsa

  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 172, and Page 374
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1758, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Nov 2015