Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano dell’Oglio

Deceased

Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1699³BornKotor
10 Jun 172425.2Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 176263.0AppointedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
16 May 176263.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
24 Jun 178889.2DiedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano dell’Oglio:
Bishop Stefano dell’Oglio (born , died ) Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro)

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 156
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Nov 2015