Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Antonio Zoglio (Zollius)

Deceased

Bishop of Rimini


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1697BornRimini
23 Jul 175254.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Rimini, Italy
26 Jul 175254.8Ordained PriestPriest of Rimini, Italy
25 Sep 175254.9AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
1 Oct 175254.9Ordained BishopBishop of Rimini, Italy
26 Jul 175759.8DiedBishop of Rimini, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio Zoglio (Zollius):
Bishop Marco Antonio Zoglio (Zollius) (born , died ) Bishop of Rimini

  • a priest for 5.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 100
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015