Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Maria Diedo

Deceased

Bishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1699Born
2 Jun 172627.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 173536.1AppointedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
11 Apr 173536.2Ordained BishopBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
13 Jul 175354.5DiedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Maria Diedo
Bishop Vincenzo Maria Diedo (born , died ) Bishop of Torcello (Turris)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

  • a priest for 27.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 410

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018