Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Paini

Deceased

Bishop of Valva e Sulmona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1711BornChieti
3 Dec 174130.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 176251.3AppointedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
28 Nov 176251.3Ordained BishopBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
1799¹87.4DiedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Paini:
Bishop Filippo Paini (born , died 1799) Bishop of Valva e Sulmona

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 431
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Nov 2015