Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felicjan Filip Wołodkowicz (Volodkovyc)

Deceased

Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)

Bishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1698¹BornNovosilky
1731²33.0AppointedBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
1731²33.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
12 Jan 175658.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
22 Nov 175860.8AppointedBishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)
18 Jul 176264.5SucceededArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
1 Feb 177880.0DiedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Felicjan Filip Wołodkowicz (Volodkovyc):
Archbishop Felicjan Filip Wołodkowicz (Volodkovyc) (died ) Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

  • a bishop for 47.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 249, and Page 444
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,041
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 254, and Page 298, and Page 303

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 16 Feb 2015