Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Triali

Deceased

Archbishop of Zadar (Zara)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1707BornIadren
29 Apr 173123.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 Nov 176153.9AppointedBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia
30 Nov 176153.9Ordained BishopBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia
23 Sep 177163.8AppointedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
13 Jan 177466.1DiedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Michael Triali:
Archbishop Michael Triali (born , died ) Archbishop of Zadar (Zara)

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013