Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josephus Augustinus Czarnecki

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Domitiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1690³BornWolkowicz
1 Nov 171626.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Dec 171626.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 173343.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Domitiopolis
28 Oct 173343.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Domitiopolis
9 Mar 173948.9DiedTitular Bishop of Domitiopolis

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Josephus Augustinus Czarnecki:
Bishop Josephus Augustinus Czarnecki (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Domitiopolis

  • a priest for 22.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 199, and Page 454
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1733, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015