Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Samuel Jan Ożga

Deceased

Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1683¹Born
7 Dec 172239.9SelectedBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
27 Sep 172340.7ConfirmedBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
20 Feb 172441.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
19 Apr 175673.2DiedBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Samuel Jan Ożga (VIAF: 311388417)
Bishop Samuel Jan Ożga (born 1683, died ) Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLviv

  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 232
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,724, Number 3
  • nm: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast