Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mattia Hirschler

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1807Born
6 Sep 182922.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 Apr 183023.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 187063.2SelectedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
27 Jun 187063.3ConfirmedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
21 Aug 187063.4Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
27 May 188174.2DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland

MicroData Summary for Mattia Hirschler
Bishop Mattia Hirschler (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWinniki, Archdiocese of Lviv, Ukraine
Ordained BishopLviv, Archdiocese of Lviv, Ukraine

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 469
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017