Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tymoteusz Pawel von Gorzeński

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno e Poznań


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1743³BornPybowicz
1 Jun 176522.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Poznań, Poland
14 Mar 176724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Poznań, Poland
4 Jun 179047.3SelectedBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
29 Nov 179047.8ConfirmedBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
1 Mar 180865.1SelectedBishop of Poznań, Poland
27 Mar 180966.1ConfirmedBishop of Poznań, Poland
15 May 180966.3InstalledBishop of Poznań, Poland
16 Jul 182178.4AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
20 Dec 182582.9DiedArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tymoteusz Pawel von Gorzeński
Archbishop Tymoteusz Pawel von Gorzeński (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno e Poznań

  • a priest for 58.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 204, and Page 313
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 383

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 18 Feb 2016