Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henryk Ludwik Plater

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

Titular Bishop of Mosynopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1817Born
4 Apr 184023.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 185841.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
27 Sep 185841.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Mosynopolis
23 Jan 185941.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mosynopolis
4 Jul 186851.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Henryk Ludwik Plater
Bishop Henryk Ludwik Plater (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIndrzyca, Archdiocese of Mohilev, Belarus
Ordained BishopCathedral, Warszawa, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}

  • a priest for 28.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 395
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017