Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Konstanty Ireneusz Łubieński

Deceased

Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1825Born
2 Jun 184924.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Jul 184924.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 186338.0AppointedBishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland
20 Dec 186338.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland
17 Jun 186944.3DiedBishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Konstanty Ireneusz Łubieński (VIAF: 280744204)
Bishop Konstanty Ireneusz Łubieński (born , died ) Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWarsaw, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Janów Podlaski, Diocese of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów)

  • a priest for 19.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,027
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 516
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1863, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jan 2017