Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Pawel Beniamin Szymański, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1793Born
29 Jun 181623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
18 Sep 185663.2AppointedBishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland
1 Feb 185763.6Ordained BishopBishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland
7 Jun 185763.9InstalledBishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland
15 Jan 186874.5DiedBishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland

MicroData Summary for Piotr Pawel Beniamin Szymański (VIAF: 161889353)
Bishop Piotr Pawel Beniamin Szymański O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVarsavia, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}
Ordained BishopSte Croix, Church, Varsavia, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 315
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jan 2017