Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Dekert

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

Titular Bishop of Halicarnassus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1786Born
19 Mar 182538.3Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
27 Sep 185871.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
27 Sep 185871.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Halicarnassus
16 Jan 185972.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Halicarnassus
19 Nov 186175.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Dekert (VIAF: 161532106)
Bishop Jan Dekert (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWarszawa, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Warszawa, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 297
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017