Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michal Jan Marszewski

Deceased

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1800Born
17 Aug 182323.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 185656.0AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
25 Jan 185756.4Ordained BishopBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
3 Sep 186767.0DiedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

MicroData Summary for Michal Jan Marszewski
Bishop Michal Jan Marszewski (born , died ) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDanzig
Ordained BishopCathedral, Warszawa, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • ob/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 594
  • ob/c2+: CB, 3 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,059
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jan 2017