Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthias Majercsak

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Titular Bishop of Ierichus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1800Born
8 Jun 182323.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Jun 182323.3Ordained PriestPriest
25 Sep 186262.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
25 Sep 186262.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ierichus
14 Dec 186262.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ierichus
23 Sep 187070.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

MicroData Summary for Matthias Majercsak
Bishop Matthias Majercsak (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOfalu, Diocese of Kraków
Ordained BishopSt Jean Baptiste, Cathedral, Warszawa, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 319
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017