Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Twarowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów)

Titular Bishop of Amyzon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1797¹BornBrzezńica
29 Jun 182124.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 185760.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland
3 Aug 185760.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyzon
21 Dec 185761.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyzon
19 Jan 186871.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Józef Twarowski:
Bishop Józef Twarowski (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów)

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1866
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013