Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Pawel Wierzbowski

Deceased

Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1818Born
31 Oct 184123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland
22 Feb 187253.5AppointedBishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland
6 Oct 187254.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland
1 Jul 189374.9DiedBishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Piotr Pawel Wierzbowski
Bishop Piotr Pawel Wierzbowski (born , died ) Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWierzbów Wielki, Diocese of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów
Ordained BishopSte Catherine, St. Petersburg

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 516
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,035
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018