Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludwik Bartłomiej Brynk

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1805Born
19 Apr 182923.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Apr 182923.6Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 187266.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine
23 Feb 187266.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
11 Aug 187266.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
19 Sep 187469.0DiedApostolic Administrator of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Ludwik Bartłomiej Brynk (VIAF: 311600783)
Bishop Ludwik Bartłomiej Brynk (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMelagiany, Diocese of Vilnius, Lithuania
Ordained BishopSt. Petersburg

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 93, and Page 175
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 350
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 14,990
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Mar 2017