Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frantisek Alojzy Zottmann

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tiraspol, Moldova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1826Born
29 Jun 186034.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 187245.6AppointedBishop of Tiraspol, Moldova
23 Jun 187245.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tiraspol, Moldova
28 Dec 188963.5ResignedBishop of Tiraspol, Moldova
12 Dec 190175.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Tiraspol, Moldova

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Frantisek Alojzy Zottmann (VIAF: 30600776)
Bishop Frantisek Alojzy Zottmann (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tiraspol

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrnbau, Diocese of Eichstätt, Germany
Ordained BishopSt. Petersburg

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 556
  • c34: CB, 8 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,534
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Mar 2017