Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Motiejus Wołonczewscki

Deceased

Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1799BornNastrany
18 Feb 182828.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 May 182929.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 184949.8AppointedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
24 Feb 185050.2Ordained BishopBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
29 May 187575.4DiedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Motiejus Wołonczewscki:
Bishop Motiejus Wołonczewscki (born , died ) Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 497

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013