Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wojciech Ziemba

Archbishop Emeritus of Warmia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1941 BornWampierzów
18 Jun 196725.6Ordained PriestPriest of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
19 Jun 198240.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
19 Jun 198240.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Falerone
4 Jul 198240.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Falerone
25 Mar 199250.4AppointedBishop of Ełk, Poland
16 Nov 200059.0AppointedArchbishop of Białystok, Poland
9 Dec 200059.1InstalledArchbishop of Białystok, Poland
30 May 200664.6AppointedArchbishop of Warmia, Poland
11 Jun 200664.6InstalledArchbishop of Warmia, Poland
15 Oct 201675.0RetiredArchbishop of Warmia, Poland

MicroData Summary for Wojciech Ziemba (VIAF: 164202187)
Archbishop Wojciech Ziemba (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Warmia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Warmia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Vatican Information Service, 30 May 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Oct 2016