Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christian Conrad Blouin, C.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lae, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1941Born
22 Aug 196321.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of Mariannhill Missionaries
3 May 196927.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Mariannhill Missionaries
15 Jan 200765.2AppointedBishop of Lae, Papua New Guinea
5 May 200765.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lae, Papua New Guinea
10 Oct 201876.9RetiredBishop of Lae, Papua New Guinea
12 Jan 201977.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Lae, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Christian Conrad Blouin
Bishop Christian Conrad Blouin C.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lae

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Sébastien, Canada
Ordained BishopSaint Mary, Cathedral, Lae, Diocese of Lae
Death PlaceLae, Diocese of Lae
Buried Place (Original)St. Joseph's Pastoral Center, Cemetery, Lae, Diocese of Lae

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,416
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2018
  • d: CB, 12 Jan 2019
  • loc: CB, 13 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 13 Jan 2019

Quantcast