Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Henricus J. Te Maarssen, S.V.D.

Bishop Emeritus of Kundiawa, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1933 Born
31 Jan 196026.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
10 May 200066.6AppointedBishop of Kundiawa, Papua New Guinea
24 Aug 200066.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kundiawa, Papua New Guinea
12 Jan 200975.3RetiredBishop of Kundiawa, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Johannes Henricus J. Te Maarssen
Bishop Johannes Henricus J. Te Maarssen S.V.D. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kundiawa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGroenlo, Netherlands

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kundiawa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,825

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast