Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Eberhard Limbrock, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Kaiser-Wilhelms-Land, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1859Born
21 Feb 189636.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
24 Mar 189636.8AppointedPrefect of Kaiser-Wilhelms-Land, Papua New Guinea
9 Sep 191455.2ResignedPrefect of Kaiser-Wilhelms-Land, Papua New Guinea
31 May 193172.0DiedPrefect Emeritus of Kaiser-Wilhelms-Land, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Eberhard Limbrock
Father Eberhard Limbrock S.V.D. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Kaiser-Wilhelms-Land

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAhlen, Germany
Death PlaceSydney, Archdiocese of Sydney, Australia

  • a priest for 35.2 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 29 Jan 2018