Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Konstantyn Dominik

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

Titular Bishop of Athribis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1870BornGniezdziewo
25 Mar 189726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
20 Jan 192857.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
20 Jan 192857.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Athribis
25 Mar 192857.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Athribis
7 Mar 194271.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Konstantyn Dominik:
Bishop Konstantyn Dominik (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,817
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,871
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013