Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Scola

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Norcia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1900Born
31 Mar 192322.6Ordained PriestPriest
28 Mar 196059.6AppointedBishop of Norcia, Italy
25 Apr 196059.7Ordained BishopBishop of Norcia, Italy
13 May 197271.7ResignedBishop of Norcia, Italy
30 Sep 198282.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Norcia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alberto Scola
Bishop Alberto Scola (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Norcia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalolziocorte

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,960, Number 32
  • bd: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,982, Page 405

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast