Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Pranzini

Deceased

Bishop of Carpi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1875BornCastel San Pietro
15 Aug 189923.6Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jun 192145.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy
13 Jun 192145.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Palaestina
26 Jun 192145.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Palaestina
18 Nov 192448.9AppointedBishop of Carpi, Italy
6 Jan 192549.0InstalledBishop of Carpi, Italy
22 Jun 193559.5DiedBishop of Carpi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Pranzini:
Bishop Giovanni Pranzini (born , died ) Bishop of Carpi

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1936
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 2 Jan 2015