Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Placido Ferniani

Deceased

Bishop of Ruvo e Bitonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1870BornFognano di Brisighella
23 Sep 189322.7Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 192251.3AppointedBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy
18 Jun 192251.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy
22 May 192554.4DiedBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Placido Ferniani:
Bishop Placido Ferniani (born , died ) Bishop of Ruvo e Bitonto

  • a priest for 31.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1925
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013