Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Pasi

Deceased

Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1870BornFaenza
9 Sep 191342.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Comacchio, Italy
9 Sep 191342.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia
19 Oct 191342.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia
15 Dec 191949.1AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
20 Sep 192352.9DiedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Pasi:
Bishop Domenico Pasi (born , died ) Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 63
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 235

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013