Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Corrado Cardinal Bafile

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1903BornL'Aquila
11 Apr 193632.8Ordained PriestPriest of L’Aquila, Italy
13 Feb 196056.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Antiochia in Pisidia
13 Feb 196056.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
19 Mar 196056.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Antiochia in Pisidia
18 Jul 197572.0AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
24 May 197672.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
24 May 197672.9Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 197672.9AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
27 Jun 198077.0RetiredPrefect of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
22 Jun 198784.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
3 Feb 2005101.6DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints

MicroData Summary for Corrado Bafile:
Cardinal Corrado Bafile (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Causes of Saints

  • a priest for 68.8 years
  • a bishop for 44.9 years
  • a cardinal for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 17
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013