Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Kilasara, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Moshi

Titular Bishop of Tisedi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1916BornKilema
4 Mar 194427.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
12 Jan 196043.8AppointedBishop of Moshi, Tanzania
8 May 196044.1Ordained BishopBishop of Moshi, Tanzania
3 Nov 196650.6ResignedBishop of Moshi, Tanzania
3 Nov 196650.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tisedi
21 Nov 197862.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Moshi, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Joseph Kilasara:
Bishop Joseph Kilasara C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Moshi

  • a priest for 34.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1960, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013