Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nestor-Désiré Nongo-Aziagbia, S.M.A.

Bishop of Bossangoa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1970 BornM’Baďki
1994¹23.8ProfessedMember of Society of African Missions
23 Aug 199828.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
14 May 201242.2AppointedBishop of Bossangoa, Central African Republic
22 Jul 201242.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bossangoa, Central African Republic

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nestor-Désiré Nongo-Aziagbia:
Bishop Nestor-Désiré Nongo-Aziagbia S.M.A. (born ) Bishop of Bossangoa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bossangoa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 May 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 14 May 2012
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,506

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013