Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Vokál

Bishop of Hradec Králové


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1958 BornHlinsko
5 Jul 198829.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
28 May 198930.7Ordained PriestPriest of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
3 Mar 201152.4AppointedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
7 May 201152.6Ordained BishopBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
14 May 201152.6InstalledBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Jan Vokál:
Bishop Jan Vokál (born ) Bishop of Hradec Králové

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hradec Králové.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 6 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,053

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013