Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacio Carrasco de Paula

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Academy for Life

Titular Bishop of Thapsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1937 BornBarcellona, Spain
8 Aug 196628.7Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
30 Jun 201072.6AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Academy for Life
15 Sep 201072.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thapsus
9 Oct 201072.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thapsus
15 Aug 201678.8RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Academy for Life

MicroData Summary for Ignacio Carrasco de Paula (VIAF: 262943132)
Bishop Ignacio Carrasco de Paula (born ) President Emeritus of Life

Please contact the Bishop through the Pontifical Academy for Life.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Sep 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,856
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Aug 2016