Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gianni Ambrosio

Bishop of Piacenza-Bobbio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1943 BornSanthià
7 Jul 196824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Vercelli, Italy
22 Dec 200764.0AppointedBishop of Piacenza-Bobbio, Italy
16 Feb 200864.1Ordained BishopBishop of Piacenza-Bobbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gianni Ambrosio:
Bishop Gianni Ambrosio (born ) Bishop of Piacenza-Bobbio

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Piacenza-Bobbio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,675

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013