Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Celso Morga Iruzubieta

Archbishop of Mérida-Badajoz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1948 BornHuércanos, Spain
24 Jun 197224.4Ordained PriestPriest of Calahorra y La Calzada-Logroño, Spain
29 Dec 201062.9AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Clergy
29 Dec 201062.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Alba Maritima
5 Feb 201163.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Alba Maritima
8 Oct 201466.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mérida-Badajoz, Spain
21 May 201567.3SucceededArchbishop of Mérida-Badajoz, Spain

MicroData Summary for Celso Morga Iruzubieta:
Archbishop Celso Morga Iruzubieta (born ) Archbishop of Mérida-Badajoz

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Mérida-Badajoz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,947
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Oct 2014
  • s: Bollettino, 21 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 21 May 2015