Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Sabogal Viana

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bogotá

Titular Bishop of Muteci


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1941BornMariquita
22 Jan 196725.6Ordained PriestPriest of Zipaquirá, Colombia
8 Mar 199654.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
8 Mar 199654.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Muteci
13 Apr 199654.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Muteci
1 Dec 201372.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Fernando Sabogal Viana:
Bishop Fernando Sabogal Viana (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bogotá

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,740
  • d: CB, 1 Dec 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015